This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 03:08:28 (UTC).

KALYSE DE PAZ, ET AL. VS FRANKLIN REYES ACOSTA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 KALYSE DE PAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRANKLIN REYES ACOSTA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8905

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KIREN DE PAZ AS WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF DECENDENT DENNIS SMITH

DE PAZ KALYSE

Defendants

AD RECEIVABLES CORP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC. DBA ADEEDO! A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ACOSTA AN INDIVIDUAL FRANKLIN REYES

REYES LOPEZ AN INDIVIDUAL SULY ELIZABETH

MAULEON AN INDIVIDUAL JOSE ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAPANIKOLAS DEMETRIOS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/31/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KAMRON

8/10/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KAMRON

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KAIDEN

8/10/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KAIDEN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

8/7/2020: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KALEB

8/6/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR KALEB

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

5/14/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Kaleb); Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Kaiden); Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Kamron); Filed by KALYSE DE PAZ (Plaintiff); KAMRON SMITH (Plaintiff); KIREN DE PAZ, as Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Decendent Dennis Smith (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADEE PLUMBING & HEATING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RELIANCE HOME SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant