This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2020 at 21:16:54 (UTC).

KALNEL GARDENS LLC VS PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 07/05/2018 KALNEL GARDENS LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2807

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KALNEL GARDENS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BLUM STEVEN A. ESQ.

BLUM STEVEN AARON ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BURTON MICHELLE KELLI ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

8/28/2019: Notice of Related Case

Separate Statement

9/24/2019: Separate Statement

Motion for Summary Adjudication

9/24/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY HO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KALNEL GARDENS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S BREACH OF DUTY TO DEFEND ITS INSURED

9/24/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY HO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KALNEL GARDENS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUE REGARDING DEFENDANT'S BREACH OF DUTY TO DEFEND ITS INSURED

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THE COMPLAINT

9/27/2019: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF THE COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/27/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Separate Statement

9/27/2019: Separate Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

9/27/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA FAMA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

9/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA FAMA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

9/27/2019: Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. BURTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

9/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. BURTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/27/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Separate Statement

11/27/2019: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

11/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Separate Statement

11/27/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. BURTON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUE REGARDING DEFENDANTS BREACH OF DUTY TO DEFEND ITS INSURED

11/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. BURTON IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUE REGARDING DEFENDANTS BREACH OF DUTY TO DEFEND ITS INSURED

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUE REGARDING DEFENDANTS BREACH OF DUTY TO DEFEND ITS INSURED

11/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUE REGARDING DEFENDANTS BREACH OF DUTY TO DEFEND ITS INSURED

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • Hearing08/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Hearing08/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 1:51 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Service; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pacific Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Kalnel Gardens, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kalnel Gardens, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: BREACH OF CONTRACT;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KALNEL GARDENS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Kelli Burton