This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2021 at 16:53:25 (UTC).

KALI UCHIS TOURING INC. VS VFLA EVENTCO, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 KALI UCHIS TOURING INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against VFLA EVENTCO, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5961

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KALI UCHIS TOURING INC.

Defendant

VFLA EVENTCO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDD CHRISTOPHER LEE

Defendant Attorney

GELLER HARVEY WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/10/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/7/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 11/06/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

11/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

12/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 12/11/2020

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL) OF 12/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

12/17/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order); Filed by VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reStatus of Removal) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Removal) of 12/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Removal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Status of Removed Case); Filed by VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order); Filed by VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 11/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KALI UCHIS TOURING INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KALI UCHIS TOURING INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KALI UCHIS TOURING INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KALI UCHIS TOURING INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less