This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 04:09:34 (UTC).

KALEIGH HARRIS VS VOLUNTEERS OF AMERICA OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 KALEIGH HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VOLUNTEERS OF AMERICA OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2299

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Defendant

VOLUNTEERS OF AMERICA OF LOS ANGELES

Guardian Ad Litem

HARRIS DE CHARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LOWARY MARK E. ESQ.

Minor Attorney

BEHJATNIA RUSSELL F. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

8/31/2017: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

8/16/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS

11/9/2017: SUMMONS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

10/16/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Unknown

8/10/2018: Unknown

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/10/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/9/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

4/4/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Stipulation and Order

12/11/2018: Stipulation and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by VOLUNTEERS OF AMERICA OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial; 1st stip cont. 3 mos. FSC 1-30-19 to 4-30-19; Trl 2-19-19 to 5-20-19); Filed by VOLUNTEERS OF AMERICA OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by VOLUNTEERS OF AMERICA OF LOS ANGELES (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2299    Hearing Date: November 19, 2020    Dept: 28

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Having considered petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows. pposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On August 16, 2017, Plaintiff Kaleigh Harris filed a complaint against Defendant Volunteers of America of Los Angeles.  The plaintiff alleges negligence and premises liability arising from a fall that occurred don February 10, 2014.

On July 23, 2020 and July 24, 2020, Petitioner De Chara Harris filed a petition to approve a compromise of pending action on behalf of Claimant Kaleigh Harris.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal After Settlement is scheduled for January 21, 2021.

PARTYS REQUEST

Petitioner De Chara Harris (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Kaleigh Harris (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, subdivision (a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Petitioner’s and Claimants attendance are not required due to Claimants age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petition is properly approved.  Petitioner has filed all required information and attachments.  The Court finds the $50,000.00 settlement to be fair and reasonable considering Claimant has healed form her fractured left arm.  The requested $12,500.00, or twenty five percent of the gross settlement, in attorney’s fees are reasonable considering the work performed in this case, including preparing for mediation.

CONCLUSION

The petition is APPROVED.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOWARY MARK E. ESQ.