This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 20:26:04 (UTC).

KAILEE CRAWFORD VS PO WAH CHUNG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 KAILEE CRAWFORD filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PO WAH CHUNG,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6744

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRAWFORD KAILEE

Defendants

CHUNG PO WAH

RASIER LLC

RASIER-CA LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOSHKARYAN VAHAGN

Defendant Attorneys

ARABI ARASH

HERZOG VANESSA KATHRYN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/20/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/20/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

5/20/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Demand for Jury Trial

5/20/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

5/20/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

5/20/2022: Complaint

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Answer

6/27/2022: Answer

Answer

6/27/2022: Answer

Answer

6/27/2022: Answer

Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF KAILEE CRAWFORD

10/11/2022: Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT OF KAILEE CRAWFORD

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER OF THE COURT

11/23/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER OF THE COURT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2024
  • Hearing05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2023
  • Hearing11/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2023
  • Hearing11/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order [proposed] Stipulated Protective Order and Order of The Court; Signed and Filed by: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant); Rasier-CA, LLC (Defendant); As to: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order [proposed] Stipulated Protective Order and Order of The Court: Filed By: Rasier-CA, LLC (Defendant),Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant),Rasier, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer Amended Answer To The Complaint of Kailee Crawford; Filed by: Po Wah Chung (Defendant); As to: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Po Wah Chung (Defendant); As to: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rasier, LLC (Defendant); As to: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rasier-CA, LLC (Defendant); As to: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff); As to: Po Wah Chung (Defendant); Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff); As to: Po Wah Chung (Defendant); Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kailee Crawford (Plaintiff); As to: Po Wah Chung (Defendant); Uber Technologies, Inc. (Defendant); Rasier, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOSHKARYAN VAHAGN