This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 06:32:42 (UTC).

KAI-LIN CHANG VS BRITTANY A. DOREMUS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 KAI-LIN CHANG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRITTANY A DOREMUS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1194

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHANG KAI-LIN

Defendants

DOREMUS BRITTANY A.

FRIEDMAN BRIAN I.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YONG JEFFREY SEECHOON

Defendant Attorney

KARREN BRENT MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/18/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/21/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

12/28/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

12/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Brittany A. Doremus (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant); As to: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Brittany A. Doremus (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant); As to: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Brittany A. Doremus (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Brian I. Friedman (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/08/2022; Service Cost: 157.51; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant); Service Date: 11/29/2022; Service Cost: 119.43; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Brittany A. Doremus (Defendant); Brian I. Friedman (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Brittany A. Doremus (Defendant); Brian I. Friedman (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kai-Lin Chang (Plaintiff); As to: Brittany A. Doremus (Defendant); Brian I. Friedman (Defendant); Southern California Permanente Medical Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARREN BRENT M.