Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 04:23:40 (UTC).

KAI JIE WANG VS CLARK LIANG

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 KAI JIE WANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLARK LIANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are OKI, DAN THOMAS and GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9507

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

OKI, DAN THOMAS

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG KAI JIE

Defendants

LIANG CLARK

CHEN MEITSU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LU TONY M. LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorneys

CHIANG MAX C. ESQ.

ROBERTS ESQ. CAMERON W.

CHIANG MAX CHIEN-HSIA ESQ.

ROBERTS CAMERON WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial and Order); Filed by KAI JIE WANG (Plaintiff); MEITSU CHEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Order (Granting Clark Liang's Application for Good Faith Settlement); Filed by CLARK LIANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by CLARK LIANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by CLARK LIANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by CLARK LIANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Application ; Filed by CLARK LIANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by KAI JIE WANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by CLARK LIANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by KAI JIE WANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Answer; Filed by CLARK LIANG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Answer; Filed by MEITSU CHEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by KAI JIE WANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by KAI JIE WANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by KAI JIE WANG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS CAMERON WILLIAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIANG MAX