This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 06:43:36 (UTC).

KAI DOST, AN INDIVIDUAL VS EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 KAI DOST, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0445

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOST AN INDIVIDUAL KAI

Defendants

EAGLE ONE SECURITY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KABIER AN INDIVIDUAL SHEKEB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESRIANI RODNEY

Defendant Attorney

MANJLAI HAROON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/16/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/24/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/24/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

8/2/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/7/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/7/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

2/16/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/16/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/22/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Defendants' Failure to Appear at CMC of 3/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); SHEKEB KABIER, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Defendants' Failure to Appear at CMC of 3/21/2023 scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 updated: Result Date to 03/21/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); SHEKEB KABIER, an Individual (Defendant); As to: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: SHEKEB KABIER, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); SHEKEB KABIER, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); SHEKEB KABIER, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KAI DOST, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: EAGLE ONE SECURITY, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); SHEKEB KABIER, an Individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less