This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 17:46:02 (UTC).

KAHTAN B. BAYATI VS TOWN SQUARE M. PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/26/2017 KAHTAN B BAYATI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TOWN SQUARE M PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9904

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

BAYATI KAHTAN B.

Defendants and Respondents

MUSHARBASH WILLIAM

JB PETROLEUM

TOWN SQUARE M. PROPERTIES LLC

Not Classified By Court

KAHTAN BAYATI LIVING TRUST

SAMPLES ROSA

NATIONWIDE LEGAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

MILLAR ESQ. JOHN W.

Other Attorneys

TALKOV ESQ. SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/23/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

5/23/2019: Unknown

Order

5/23/2019: Order

Unknown

2/27/2019: Unknown

Unknown

2/19/2019: Unknown

Unknown

2/1/2019: Unknown

Unknown

1/18/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

6/26/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Related Case

6/1/2018: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/29/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/29/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Summons

12/26/2017: Summons

Unknown

12/26/2017: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/26/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/26/2017: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docketat 4:10 PM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOrder (Ruling on the Court's Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter;) of 05/23/2019 and Court's Tentative Ruling); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by KAHTAN B. BAYATI (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Default; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by KAHTAN B. BAYATI (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-26 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by TOWN SQUARE M. PROPERTIES LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KAHTAN B. BAYATI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KAHTAN B. BAYATI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less