This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 00:59:10 (UTC).

KAHLIL VINCSON VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 KAHLIL VINCSON filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0858

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VINCSON KAHLIL

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM ELEAZAR D.

XIE MATT

Defendant Attorney

ALEGADO JOSHUA C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/23/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

1/11/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Kahlil Vincson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kahlil Vincson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2022; Service Cost: 109.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kahlil Vincson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kahlil Vincson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kahlil Vincson (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSHUA C. ALEGADO