This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2023 at 02:44:45 (UTC).

KAGEFF, THOMAS VS KAGEFF, SUSIE FONG

Case Summary

On 08/31/2022 KAGEFF, THOMAS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KAGEFF, SUSIE FONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9622

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KAGEFF THOMAS

Respondent

KAGEFF SUSIE FONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WALLERSTEIN MICHAEL AARON

 

Court Documents

Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order

4/21/2023: Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order

Notice - Entry of Judgment

4/11/2023: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Judgment

4/11/2023: Judgment

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Declarations)

4/5/2023: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Declarations)

Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170 (Declarations)

4/5/2023: Declaration - Default FL170 - Declaration - Default FL170 (Declarations)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

10/20/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

9/1/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

6/5/2023: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices)

Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearances)

4/5/2023: Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers - Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearances)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

1/18/2023: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

1/18/2023: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations)

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

10/20/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations)

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

10/20/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

10/20/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service (Comment)

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

9/26/2022: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service)

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions)

8/31/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions)

Summons - Summons (Summons)

8/31/2022: Summons - Summons (Summons)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (Notices) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketOrder - Qualified Domestic Relations Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketProposed Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order (Proposed Order - Qualified Domestic Relations Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketJudgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170 (Declaration - Default FL170 (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers (Appearances) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declarations) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketSummons (Summons (Summons) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Comment) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - $435.00 (Petitions) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA (Declarations) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less