This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 09:26:15 (UTC).

KAFTARIAN, EDWARD VS KAFTARIAN, SHERYL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 KAFTARIAN, EDWARD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KAFTARIAN, SHERYL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSEN, DAVID A., AHARONOV, AMIR and SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1395

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSEN, DAVID A.

AHARONOV, AMIR

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KAFTARIAN EDWARD

Claimants

CALPERS RETIREMENT PLAN

NATIONWIDE STATE OF CALIFORNIA SAVINGS PLUS PROGRAM 401K

NATIONWIDE STATE OF CALIFORNIA SAVINGS PLUS PROGRAM 457B

THE UNIVERSIT OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SABNGS PROGRAM - UC DEFERRED COMPENSATION PLAN

THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM - UC 457B PLAN

TIAA _ THE JOHN HOPKINS UNIVERSITY INCOME DEFERRAL 403B PLAN

STATE OF CALIFORNIA HUMAN RESOURCES DEPARTMENT SAVINGS PLUS PLAN

Respondent

KAFTARIAN SHERYL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

Respondent and Claimant Attorneys

BOYAMIAN TALINE KIZIRIAN

MOVSESYAN ALFRED

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement) - Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing

3/8/2022: Proposed Order - Reschedule/ Reissuance of RFO (Agreement) - Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing

Stipulation and Order - No Fee - Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing (New Date: 5/19/22 830am F50)

3/9/2022: Stipulation and Order - No Fee - Agreement and Order to Reschedule Hearing (New Date: 5/19/22 830am F50)

Writ - Returned - $0.00 - Collected

3/23/2022: Writ - Returned - $0.00 - Collected

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

5/3/2022: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

5/3/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Witness List - Witness List

5/3/2022: Witness List - Witness List

Trial Brief - Trial Brief

5/3/2022: Trial Brief - Trial Brief

Witness List - Respondent's Witness List

5/5/2022: Witness List - Respondent's Witness List

Exhibit List - Respondent's Exhibit List

5/5/2022: Exhibit List - Respondent's Exhibit List

Trial Brief - Respondent's Trial Brief

5/5/2022: Trial Brief - Respondent's Trial Brief

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

5/5/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

Minute Order

5/19/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/19/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/19/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Notice of Withdrawal of Writ of Execution

11/19/2021: Notice - Notice of Withdrawal of Writ of Execution

Notice - Notice of Withdrawal of Writ of Execution

11/19/2021: Notice - Notice of Withdrawal of Writ of Execution

Proof of Service - A copy of the Writ and a Notice of Attachment/Levy was sserved on the Judgment Debtor.

2/15/2022: Proof of Service - A copy of the Writ and a Notice of Attachment/Levy was sserved on the Judgment Debtor.

Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Electronic Service

226 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department F50 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 8:30 AM in Department F50 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Trial Readiness Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department Y at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Mandatory Settlement Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Order Made

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
234 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case) (On Demand without the Income and Expense Declaration (FL150) ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less