This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2021 at 15:23:35 (UTC).

JUSTINO MONTIEL VS HITACHI AMERICA, LTD., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 JUSTINO MONTIEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against HITACHI AMERICA, LTD . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8907

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTIEL JUSTINO

Defendants

KOKI HOLDINGS AMERICA LTD.

HITACHI AMERICA LTD.

HITACHI SOLUTIONS AMERICA LTD.

KOKI HOLDINGS CO. LTD.

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

HITACHI LTD.

HITACHI HIGH-TECH SCIENCE AMERICA INC.

TAIWAN HIKOKI CO. LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHORSANDI ARASH ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/22/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

1/27/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2023
  • Hearing12/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JUSTINO MONTIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JUSTINO MONTIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JUSTINO MONTIEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HITACHI SOLUTIONS AMERICA LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where HITACHI AMERICA LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where HITACHI LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where KOKI HOLDINGS AMERICA LTD. is a litigant