This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 05:12:24 (UTC).

JUSTIN HURWITZ VS WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 JUSTIN HURWITZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0872

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HURWITZ JUSTIN

Defendants

ENDEAVOR CONTENT

WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC AKA ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN BRYAN J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GROTZINGER JORDAN D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

1/18/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES

1/18/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/18/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

5/31/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

2/22/2022: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/21/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/21/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • Hearing09/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • Hearing09/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 02/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES: Filed By: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant),Endeavor Content (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES: Result Date changed from 01/19/2023 to 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 09/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/18/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, to William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Endeavor Content (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Endeavor Content, a Delaware Limited Liability Company to Endeavor Content

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Justin Hurwitz (Plaintiff); As to: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, (Defendant); Endeavor Content, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Justin Hurwitz (Plaintiff); As to: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, (Defendant); Endeavor Content, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Bryan J. Freedman, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less