This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2022 at 05:08:59 (UTC).

JUSTIN HURWITZ VS WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 JUSTIN HURWITZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0872

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HURWITZ JUSTIN

Defendants

ENDEAVOR CONTENT

WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC AKA ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREEDMAN BRYAN J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

GROTZINGER JORDAN D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/21/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/21/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

2/22/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

5/31/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 04/04/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 updated: Result Date to 06/08/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS; Signed and Filed by: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant); Endeavor Content (Defendant); As to: Justin Hurwitz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS: Filed By: Endeavor Content (Defendant),William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Justin Hurwitz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, to William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Endeavor Content (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Endeavor Content, a Delaware Limited Liability Company to Endeavor Content

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Justin Hurwitz (Plaintiff); As to: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, (Defendant); Endeavor Content, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Justin Hurwitz (Plaintiff); As to: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, (Defendant); Endeavor Content, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Bryan J. Freedman, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEDMAN BRYAN J. ESQ.