This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2022 at 04:35:48 (UTC).

JUNGEUN KAREN KIM VS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 JUNGEUN KAREN KIM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8578

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM JUNGEUN KAREN

Defendant

ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HWANG PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/7/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/23/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

4/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Order - Dismissal

4/6/2022: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/06/2022

4/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 04/06/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 04/06/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jungeun Karen Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jungeun Karen Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jungeun Karen Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICE CONCEPTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HWANG PHILLIP