This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2022 at 12:31:42 (UTC).

JUNG SOOK JO VS CANDLEWOOD COUNTRY CLUB, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 JUNG SOOK JO filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CANDLEWOOD COUNTRY CLUB,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9108

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JO JUNG SOOK

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CANDLEWOOD COUNTRY CLUB

LEIBLE TIM

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOYNER WAYNE

Defendant Attorney

LEON LUCIO

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/15/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/15/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/15/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Cross-Complaint

8/8/2022: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/4/2022: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/10/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

10/17/2022: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2025
  • Hearing03/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Jung Sook Jo on 03/15/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Jung Sook Jo as to Candlewood Country Club

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Jung Sook Jo (Plaintiff); As to: Candlewood Country Club (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Wayne Joyner (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketAddress for Wayne Joyner (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Candlewood Country Club (Defendant); As to: ROES 1 through 20, Inclusive (Defendant on defendant's claim)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketSummons CROSS-COMPLAINT; Issued and Filed by: Candlewood Country Club (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Candlewood Country Club (Defendant); As to: Jung Sook Jo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jung Sook Jo (Plaintiff); As to: Candlewood Country Club (Defendant); Tim Leible (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jung Sook Jo (Plaintiff); As to: Candlewood Country Club (Defendant); Tim Leible (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANDLEWOOD COUNTRY CLUB is a litigant