This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2019 at 04:44:56 (UTC).

JUNG JA MIN, ET AL. VS YOUNG GUK HUR, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 JUNG JA MIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YOUNG GUK HUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3738

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHU IN SOON AN INDIVIDUAL

MIN JUNG JA AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

HUR YOUNG GUK AN INDIVIDUAL

CHUN YONG BOK AKA PAUL Y. CHUN AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE W. DAN

Defendant Attorney

PITHA MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

8/14/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/15/2019: Answer

Notice of Related Case

8/16/2019: Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

8/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/16/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/8/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jung Ja Min,, an Individual (Plaintiff); In Soon Chu,, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jung Ja Min,, an Individual (Plaintiff); In Soon Chu,, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Young Guk Hur,, an individual (Defendant); Yong Bok Chun (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Young Guk Hur,, an individual (Defendant); Yong Bok Chun (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jung Ja Min,, an Individual (Plaintiff); In Soon Chu,, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jung Ja Min,, an Individual (Plaintiff); In Soon Chu,, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jung Ja Min,, an Individual (Plaintiff); In Soon Chu,, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jung Ja Min,, an Individual (Plaintiff); In Soon Chu,, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PITHA MARTIN