This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2023 at 18:00:55 (UTC).

JUNE MARTIN VS KAHEN & KAHEN, MD., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 JUNE MARTIN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against KAHEN KAHEN, MD , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2583

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN JUNE

Defendants

KAHEN & KAHEN MD. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KAHEN NAVID

KAHEN TANAZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARARI NEAMA CORY

Defendant Attorney

RAMIREZ OSCAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2025
  • Hearing06/23/2025 at 09:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2025
  • Hearing06/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice OF RULING AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: JUNE MARTIN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/23/2025 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...): Status Date changed from 02/17/2023 to 02/17/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) to (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 02/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 02/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: KAHEN & KAHEN, MD., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); NAVID KAHEN (Defendant); TANAZ KAHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JUNE MARTIN (Plaintiff); As to: KAHEN & KAHEN, MD., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); NAVID KAHEN (Defendant); TANAZ KAHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JUNE MARTIN (Plaintiff); As to: KAHEN & KAHEN, MD., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); NAVID KAHEN (Defendant); TANAZ KAHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JUNE MARTIN (Plaintiff); As to: KAHEN & KAHEN, MD., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); NAVID KAHEN (Defendant); TANAZ KAHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JUNE MARTIN (Plaintiff); As to: KAHEN & KAHEN, MD., INC., a California corporation (Defendant); NAVID KAHEN (Defendant); TANAZ KAHEN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less