Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 09:35:09 (UTC).

CHRISTENSEN, MARGARET JUNE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 CHRISTENSEN, MARGARET JUNE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1504

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CHRISTENSEN PAUL EUGENE

Decedent

JUNE CHRISTENSEN

 

Court Documents

Notice - Notice of correction

7/12/2021: Notice - Notice of correction

Declaration - Declaration In Support Of Bond Waiver.

6/22/2021: Declaration - Declaration In Support Of Bond Waiver.

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

6/22/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

6/22/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

Notice - Administration to Creditors

6/22/2021: Notice - Administration to Creditors

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

6/22/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver

Minute Order

6/23/2021: Minute Order

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

6/29/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

6/29/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

6/29/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

6/29/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - Waiver of notice

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

5/7/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

5/7/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Will Deposited - 4 pgs - Dated - 05/25/1984

4/12/2021: Will Deposited - 4 pgs - Dated - 05/25/1984

Miscellaneous Document

4/12/2021: Miscellaneous Document

Waiver - (No Fee) - of Notice

4/12/2021: Waiver - (No Fee) - of Notice

Minute Order

4/7/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - Ancillary Probate

2/18/2021: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - Ancillary Probate

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of correction ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (Waiver of notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWill Deposited (4 pgs - Dated - 05/25/1984 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (of Notice ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWaiver - (No Fee) (of Bond by Heir of Beneficiary ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketWill Deposited (1st Codicil 3 pgs - Dated - 06/07/1994 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial) (Ancillary Probate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less