Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2021 at 11:30:35 (UTC).

JUNE CALHOUN, LLC VS MATTHEW ZIMBRIC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 JUNE CALHOUN, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MATTHEW ZIMBRIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0458

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNE CALHOUN LLC

Defendants

ZIMBRIC MATTHEW

GRAVES SKYLAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GEER GREGORY B.

STONE JASON M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MATTHEW ZIMBRIC)

4/6/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MATTHEW ZIMBRIC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SKYLAR GRAVES)

4/6/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (SKYLAR GRAVES)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/6/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • Hearing09/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Matthew Zimbric)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Skylar Graves)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by June Calhoun, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by June Calhoun, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by June Calhoun, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by June Calhoun, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEER GREGORY B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STONE JASON M.