This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 18:22:05 (UTC).

JUNE BARBOZA, ET AL. VS WILFRED WALTON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 JUNE BARBOZA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WILFRED WALTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3393

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARBOZA JUNE

BARBOZA KARLA

RAMBLEZ MIGUEL

Defendants

RASIER LLC A COMPANY

RASIER-CA LLC A COMPANY

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A CORPORATION

WALTON WILFRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOKER ROBERT L. II

Defendant Attorney

GOLUB BETH I

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/9/2021: Answer

Answer

8/9/2021: Answer

Answer

8/9/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/9/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANABEL

7/8/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANABEL

PI General Order

7/1/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

7/2/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANABEL

7/2/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ANABEL

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/23/2021: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Uber Technologies, Inc., a Corporation (Defendant); Rasier, LLC, a Company (Defendant); Rasier-CA, LLC, a Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rasier, LLC, a Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rasier-CA, LLC, a Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff); Anabel Barboza, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff); Anabel Barboza, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff); Anabel Barboza, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Anabel); Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff); Anabel Barboza, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Anabel); Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff); Anabel Barboza, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff); Anabel Barboza, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by June Barboza (Plaintiff); Miguel Ramblez (Plaintiff); Anabel Barboza, by and through GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rasier-CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUB, BETH ISAACS