Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:08:50 (UTC).

JUN HONG PARK VS WILSHIRE STATE BANK ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 JUN HONG PARK filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against WILSHIRE STATE BANK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2455

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARK JUN HONG

Defendants and Respondents

WILSHIRE STATE BANK

DOES 1-50

PLANNED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF SIMON CHANG

CHANG SIMON

Defendant Attorneys

KOLETSKY ROY AARON

SONG JOON W

KOLETSKY ROY A.

SONG JOON W.

 

Court Documents

Judgment

5/15/2019: Judgment

Minute Order

3/28/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

3/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Opposition

3/15/2019: Opposition

Opposition

3/15/2019: Opposition

Demurrer

2/13/2019: Demurrer

Case Management Statement

2/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Demurrer

2/22/2019: Demurrer

Declaration re: Due Diligence

2/22/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Minute Order

12/10/2018: Minute Order

Request for Judicial Notice

12/11/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Reply

12/5/2018: Reply

Minute Order

12/17/2018: Minute Order

Notice

12/4/2018: Notice

Demurrer

11/5/2018: Demurrer

Motion for Order

10/25/2018: Motion for Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Judgment (Judgment for Dismissal); Filed by Bank of Hope Erroneously Sued As Wilshire State Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Planned Development (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by Bank of Hope Erroneously Sued As Wilshire State Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Judgment ((Proposed) Judgment of Dismissal After Sustaining of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint without Leave to Amend); Filed by Planned Development (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Jun Hong Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Order (court's tentative ruling re: demurrer); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2018
  • Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (181024359622)); Filed by Planned Development Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jun Hong Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jun Hong Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE STATE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOLETSKY ROY AARON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SONG JOON W. ESQ.