This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:25:49 (UTC).

JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD VS PRVT HOLDINGS CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 a Other - Other Judgment case was filed by JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD against PRVT HOLDINGS CORP in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8159

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JUMBLEBERRY ENTERPRISES USA LTD.

Respondents and Defendants

KAMRANI KEVIN

KAMRAN KEVIN

PRVT HOLDINGS CORP.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KEVIN KAMRANI TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT

8/28/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT KEVIN KAMRANI TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

9/20/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/8/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration

2/8/2019: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/8/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement

2/8/2019: Separate Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

2/8/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Exhibit List

4/9/2019: Exhibit List

Other -

4/9/2019: Other -

Exhibit List

4/9/2019: Exhibit List

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/9/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition

4/9/2019: Opposition

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2019: Request for Dismissal

Unknown

7/13/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service

6/13/2018: Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE

6/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS

5/31/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT

5/31/2018: COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order shortening time to serve) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Responses to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Evidence); Filed by PRVT Holdings Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kevin Kamrani); Filed by PRVT Holdings Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOther - (Appendix of Exhibits); Filed by PRVT Holdings Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by PRVT Holdings Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by PRVT Holdings Corp. (Defendant); Kevin Kamrani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jumbleberry Enterprises USA Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION AND ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FlLE}zamor“‘“ DLA PIPER LLP (US) Superior C(“gs Angeles MILES M. COOLEY (SBN 206783) o 2018 miles.cooley@dlapiper.com WA 3 of Court

COLLEEN M. McELROY(SBN 307490) e inceriverk

colleen.mcelroy@dlapiper.com s\\mW,Devm 2000 Avenue of the Stars By = “Qobinso"

Suite 400, North Tower “higTEne

Los Angeles, California 90067-4704

Tel: 310.595.3000

Fax: 310.595.3300

Attorneys for Plaintiff Jumbleberry Enterprises USA Litd.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES | 33708159

Jumbleberry Enterprises USA Ltd., CASE NO. o | Plaintiff, COMPLAINT FOR RECOGNITION AND

ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY

V. JUDGMENT

PRVT Holdings Corp. and Kevin Kamran Cal. Civ. Proc. Code §§ 1713 et seq. aka Kevin Kamrani,

Defendants.

Plaintiff Jumbleberry Enterprises USA Ltd. (“JB USA™) for its Complaint against Defendants PRVT Holdings Corp. (“PRVT”) and Kevin Kamran aka Kevin Kamrani (*Kamrani”) (collectively, “Defendants’) alleges as follows:

PARTIES

1. JB USA is a digital marketing network incorporated pursuant to the laws of Canada. Its principal place of business is located at 171 East Liberty Street, Suite 310, Toronto, Ontario, M6k 3P6.

2. PRVT is a holding company incorporated pursuant to the laws of California, with its principal place of business at 9350 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 203, Beverly Hills, CA, 90212.

3. Upon JB USA’s information and belief, Kamrani is the sole Officer and Director WEST\281066123.1 -1-