This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 03:24:57 (UTC).

JULIO SANDOVAL VS P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 JULIO SANDOVAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against P F CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3060

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL JULIO

Defendants

P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

P.F. CHANG'S III LLC AN ARIZONA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSNER MICHAEL R

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER DECKER

9/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER DECKER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUSAN WALSH

9/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUSAN WALSH

Motion to Compel Arbitration

9/19/2022: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JANE CALVIN

9/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JANE CALVIN

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

9/19/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

5/12/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

5/12/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

6/8/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMIE SERB, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

6/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMIE SERB, ESQ. RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/27/2022

6/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 06/27/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Related Case

7/6/2022: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER

7/11/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER

Case Management Statement

8/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER

8/9/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL/DEFAULTS) OF 08/09/2022

8/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL/DEFAULTS) OF 08/09/2022

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Hearing10/03/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); P.F. CHANG'S III, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of JANE CALVIN); Filed by P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); P.F. CHANG'S III, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Susan Walsh); Filed by P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); P.F. CHANG'S III, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Christopher Decker); Filed by P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); P.F. CHANG'S III, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); P.F. CHANG'S III, LLC, an Arizona Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 56, Holly J. Fujie, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal/Defaults) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal/Defaults) of 08/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JULIO SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JULIO SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JULIO SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JULIO SANDOVAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PF CHANG'S A CALIFORNIA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Crosner, Michael R