This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2020 at 04:38:51 (UTC).

JULIO PINEDA VS HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 JULIO PINEDA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3577

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA JULIO

Defendants

HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC

REYES BEVERAGE GROUP

DURAN GABRIEL

REYES HOLDINGS LLC

HARBOR DISTRIBUTING CO

BEVERAGE ALLIED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHAKSHOOY BOB B. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DUMITRESCU SILVIANA DANA JR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/3/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1

1/27/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 4

1/27/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 4

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5

1/27/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 5

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 6

1/27/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 6

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 7

1/27/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 7

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3

1/27/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 3

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2

1/27/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2

Notice of Settlement

1/29/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/29/2020

1/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JULIO PINEDA

12/10/2018: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JULIO PINEDA

Case Management Statement

6/21/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice of Ruling

4/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JULIO PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((Estimate4-6 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by JULIO PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in Limine No 3); Filed by HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC (Defendant); GABRIEL DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in Limine No 6); Filed by HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC (Defendant); GABRIEL DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMotion in Limine (Motion in Limine No 7); Filed by HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC (Defendant); GABRIEL DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS HARBOR DISTRIBUTING, LLC AND GABRIEL DURAN; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC (Defendant); GABRIEL DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Filed by HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC (Defendant); GABRIEL DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by JULIO PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JULIO PINEDA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. MOTOR VEHICLE NEGLIGENCE, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, NEGLIGENT HIRING, NEGLIGENT UNDERTAKING, NEGLIGENT RETENTION, NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION AD NEGLIGENT TRAINING; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REYES BEVERAGES GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AKA is a litigant

Latest cases where HARBOR DISTRIBUTING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHAKSHOOY BOB B. ESQ.