This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 13:37:15 (UTC).

JULIO MILLIAN VS LIBER MACHON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 JULIO MILLIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIBER MACHON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5283

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLIAN JULIO

Defendants

MACHON LIBER

MACHON SIDNEY ALISAAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARIMIAN SHAHIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/4/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

11/4/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

11/4/2022: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/4/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/4/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2024
  • Hearing11/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2024
  • Hearing05/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2024
  • Hearing04/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Julio Millian (Plaintiff); As to: Liber Machon (Defendant); Sidney Alisaah Machon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Julio Millian (Plaintiff); As to: Liber Machon (Defendant); Sidney Alisaah Machon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Julio Millian (Plaintiff); As to: Liber Machon (Defendant); Sidney Alisaah Machon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less