This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 11:46:34 (UTC).

JULIO MARTINEZ VS. FRESH & READY FOODS LLC, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 JULIO MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FRESH READY FOODS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5378

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINEZ JULIO ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

RJ ARROYO INC. A CORPORATION

FRESH & READY FOODS LLC A LIMITED

LEHMAN FOODS INC. A CORPORATION

CL ENTERPRISES INC. A BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MICHELMAN & ROBINSON LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

SUMMONS

6/21/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

6/21/2017: Unknown

REGISTER OF ACTIONS

6/21/2017: REGISTER OF ACTIONS

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CLASS ALLEGATIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC

6/21/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CLASS ALLEGATIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ETC

JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO 2-13-17

6/21/2017: JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO 2-13-17

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

6/21/2017: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF JULIO MARTINEZ'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL BREAKS AND MEAL BREAK PREMIUM WAGES IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 512 AND 226.7; ETC

6/21/2017: PLAINTIFF JULIO MARTINEZ'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR 1. FAILURE TO PROVIDE MEAL BREAKS AND MEAL BREAK PREMIUM WAGES IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 512 AND 226.7; ETC

ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/21/2017: ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF INCOMING TRANSFER

TRANSFER RECEIPT

6/21/2017: TRANSFER RECEIPT

ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/21/2017: ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION

6/21/2017: ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION

LETTER

6/21/2017: LETTER

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

6/21/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT - COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES; AND ORDER

6/21/2017: STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT - COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES; AND ORDER

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

6/21/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/27/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 48; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 48; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by MARTINEZ, JULIO, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by FRESH & READY FOODS LLC, A LIMITED (Defendant); LEHMAN FOODS INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); RJ ARROYO INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2017
  • TRANSFER RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MARTINEZ, JULIO, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO TRANSFER ACTION TO THE SUPERIOR COURT - COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES; AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • REGISTER OF ACTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by FRESH & READY FOODS LLC, A LIMITED (Defendant); LEHMAN FOODS INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant); RJ ARROYO INC., A CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RJ ARROYO INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LEHMAN FOODS INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FRESH AND READY FOODS LLC is a litigant