This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 03:15:34 (UTC).

JULIO JOSE OCHOA VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 JULIO JOSE OCHOA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9165

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

OCHOA JULIO JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

APPLEBY THOMAS

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DAVID ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MCGUIRE STEVE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORY 2.8

10/23/2017: RULING RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORY 2.8

Minute Order

10/23/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORY 2.8; ETC.

8/25/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORY 2.8; ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/14/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

2/2/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/2/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Order

12/11/2018: Order

Minute Order

12/11/2018: Minute Order

Notice

12/11/2018: Notice

Unknown

10/4/2018: Unknown

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

7/5/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

12/26/2017: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice (Of Ruling); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to continue trial); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketOrder (granting trial continuance); Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Defendant's ex parte application to continue trial;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, Fsc (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (North District); Filed by Julio Jose Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles, City of (Defendant); Thomas Appleby (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketANSWER OF THE DEFENDANTS CITY OF LOS ANGELES AND THOMAS APPLEBY TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Julio Jose Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Julio Jose Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julio Jose Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****9165    Hearing Date: January 26, 2021    Dept: 29

****9165 Julio Jose Ochoa v. City of Los Angeles, et al.

Defendants’ Motion for Order Compelling Response to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions and Defendants’ Motion for Order that Truth of Matters in Requests for Admission be Deemed Admitted; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED in part.

Plaintiff’s counsel has demonstrated that verified responses of all discovery at issue were served on 1/20/21, after these motions were filed on 12/1/20. Declaration of Jason Smith, Exhibits 1 and 2. Therefore, an order compelling responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two, or to deem Requests for Admission admitted is not warranted. Code Civ. Proc. ; 2033.280(c).

However, Defendants are entitled to an award of sanctions as Plaintiff did not respond until after Defendants filed these motions. Failure to timely respond to discovery without substantial justification is discovery abuse. Code Civ. Proc. ; 2023.010. Imposition of sanctions is mandatory where the failure to properly respond necessitated the motion. Cal Code Civil Procedure ; 2033.280(c).

Accordingly, the Court imposes total sanctions of $400.00 for both motions against Plaintiff, Julio Jose Ochoa, and his attorney of record, David Azizi, Esq., jointly and severally.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



Case Number: ****9165    Hearing Date: January 19, 2021    Dept: 29

****9165 Julio Jose Ochoa v. City of Los Angeles, et al.

The unopposed Motion by Defendant, City of Los Angeles, for Order Compelling Responses to Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, Set Two; Request for Sanctions is GRANTED.

Plaintiff, Julio Jose Ochoa, is ordered to serve verified responses without objections to Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, Set Two, served on Plaintiff on 5/26/20. (Code Civ. Proc. ; 2030.290(b).)

Defendant is entitled to an award of sanctions of $250.00 against Jose Julio Ochoa, and his attorney of record, Law Offices of David Azizi.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



Case Number: ****9165    Hearing Date: August 25, 2020    Dept: 29

Motion by Defendant City of Los Angeles for Order Compelling Responses to Supplemental Discovery is GRANTED.

Plaintiff Julio Jose Ochoa is ordered to serve verified responses without objections to Supplemental Interrogatory and Supplemental Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents served on Plaintiff on 12/23/19. (Code Civ. Proc. ; 2030.290(b).) The responses are due within 15 days of notice of this order

The Court imposes sanctions of $250.00 joint and severally against Plaintiff Julio Jose Ochoa and his attorney of record Law Offices of David Azizi, to be paid to Defendant City of Los Angeles.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

   

NOTE:  PARTIES MUST APPEAR THIS DATE AS A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS ALSO SET ON CALENDAR FOR THIS DATE. 

In order to comply with social distancing regulations, all parties are strongly encouraged to appear via video or telephonic services offered by the Court, through LACourtConnect.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGUIRE STEVE M. ESQ.