This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2022 at 21:55:33 (UTC).

JULIO CESAR BLANCO, ET AL. VS YURIY SOGOMONOV, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 JULIO CESAR BLANCO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YURIY SOGOMONOV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0083

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLANCO JULIO CESAR

THREE STARS BUILDERS INC.

Defendants

WEISE DAVID B

SOGOMONOV YURIY

T&E BUILDERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLORES-BURT YOLANDA

Defendant Attorneys

MILLER DAVID SCOTT

CHITSAZ HOUMAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

6/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Settlement

5/26/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

5/27/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/3/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/8/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/11/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/19/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/9/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/9/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/9/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

1/3/2020: Answer

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Yolanda Flores-Burt (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Yolanda Flores-Burt (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by T&E Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julio Cesar Blanco (Plaintiff); Three Stars Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORES-BURT YOLANDA