This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2020 at 00:13:38 (UTC).

JULIETTE COUDERC VS MICHAEL QUICHO ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 JULIETTE COUDERC filed an Other lawsuit against MICHAEL QUICHO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9291

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

COUDERC JULIETTE

Defendants and Respondents

QUICHO MARIA

DOES 1 TO 10

QUICHO JEFFREY

QUICHO MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEWIS JEFFREY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TIMONTY G. MCFARLIN

MCFARLIN TIMONTY G.

MCFARLIN TIMOTHY GEORGE

NAKANO JARROD

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL WITNESS LIST

10/3/2019: Witness List - WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL WITNESS LIST

Witness List

10/7/2019: Witness List

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JARROD Y. NAKANO REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

10/7/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JARROD Y. NAKANO REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS

10/7/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

DEFENDANTS MICHAEL QUICHO, JEFFREY QUICHO AND MARIA QUICHO'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.

9/25/2018: DEFENDANTS MICHAEL QUICHO, JEFFREY QUICHO AND MARIA QUICHO'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.

DEFENDANTS MICHAEL QUICHO, JEFFREY QUICHO AND MARIA QUICHO'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.

9/25/2018: DEFENDANTS MICHAEL QUICHO, JEFFREY QUICHO AND MARIA QUICHO'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES.

Minute Order -

10/2/2018: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURREN OF DEFENDANTS MICAHEL QUICHO, JEFFREY QUICIIO AND MARIA QUICHO TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF HAYDEN

8/15/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURREN OF DEFENDANTS MICAHEL QUICHO, JEFFREY QUICIIO AND MARIA QUICHO TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF HAYDEN

DECLARATION OF HAYDEN T. TRAVER IN SUPPORT OF DCF?ENDANTS MICHAEL QUICFIO, JEFFREY QUICHO AND MARIA QUICHO'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

8/15/2018: DECLARATION OF HAYDEN T. TRAVER IN SUPPORT OF DCF?ENDANTS MICHAEL QUICFIO, JEFFREY QUICHO AND MARIA QUICHO'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

8/30/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

6/14/2018: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

6/14/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

SUMMONS -

6/7/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF PENAL CODE SECTIONS 502 AND 528.5 ;ETC

6/7/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF PENAL CODE SECTIONS 502 AND 528.5 ;ETC

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2021
  • Hearing12/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:52 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47, Randolph M. Hammock, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNotice ( of Continuance); Filed by Juliette Couderc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juliette Couderc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Juliette Couderc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juliette Couderc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Juliette Couderc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Juliette Couderc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF PENAL CODE SECTIONS 502 AND 528.5 ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juliette Couderc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709291    Hearing Date: November 25, 2019    Dept: 47

Juliette Couderc v. Michael Quicho, et al.

 

MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS AND FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Michael Quicho, Jeffrey Quicho and Maria Quicho

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Plaintiff Juliette Couderc

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

Plaintiff alleges that Defendant Michael Quicho created fake Snapchat profiles purporting to be Plaintiff and used those profiles to send naked photographs of women to teenage boys, implying the photographs were Plaintiff.

Defendants Michael Quicho, Jeffrey Quicho and Maria Quicho move for an order establishing admissions and for sanctions.

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Michael Quicho, Jeffrey Quicho and Maria Quicho’s motion for order establishing admissions and for sanctions is DENIED AS MOOT.

DISCUSSION:

Motion for Order Establishing Admissions

Defendants Michael Quicho, Jeffrey Quicho and Maria Quicho filed this motion to establish admissions before the hearing in this case on October 8, 2019. At that hearing, Plaintiff was ordered to respond only to the RFAs “that are general, not any regarding liability, that are emailed from the defendant.” (Minute Order, 10/8/19, at p. 1.) Defendants have not filed any reply or further briefing indicating whether they emailed the narrowed-down RFAs and, if so, whether Plaintiff responded.

Accordingly, the motion is DENIED AS MOOT in light of the parties’ agreement at the October 8 hearing that Plaintiff would be required to answer only a narrower set of RFAs. If Defendants did not receive those RFAs, they should have moved to compel compliance with the Court’s October 8 order or filed a reply brief indicating that Defendant served a narrower set of RFAs on Plaintiff after the October 8 hearing and Plaintiff did not respond.

Moving party to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: November 25, 2018 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Any party may submit on the tentative ruling by contacting the courtroom via email at Smcdept47@lacourt.org