This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 00:32:54 (UTC).

JULIETA PAYUMO VS FELICIA SUZANNE FADLON

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 JULIETA PAYUMO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FELICIA SUZANNE FADLON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3755

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PAYUMO JULIETA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 509

FADLON FELICIA SUZANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ROCA JENNA ESQ.

ROCA JENNA RAE

Defendant Attorney

MARTIN FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/2/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

6/2/2017: SUMMONS

Minute Order

6/3/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/4/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

2/25/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/25/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

12/28/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

12/28/2018: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order

12/3/2018: Order

Ex Parte Application

12/3/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/16/2018: Minute Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Julieta Payumo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jenna R. Roca, Esq. re OSC re Service); Filed by Julieta Payumo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Felicia Suzanne Fadlon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Felicia Suzanne Fadlon (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Julieta Payumo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketOrder (on Plaintiff's Ex parte Application for Order to Continue Trial); Filed by Julieta Payumo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to continue trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Jury Trial; Ex-Parte Proceedings)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julieta Payumo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3755    Hearing Date: March 10, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION; MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED

On February 10, 2020, Plaintiff Julieta Payumo served a notice of deposition on Defendant Felicia Fadlon for a deposition on February 20, 2020. On January 24, 2020, Plaintiff served requests for admission on Defendant. The earliest the responses could be due would be February 24, 2020. On February 14, 2020, Plaintiff filed a motion to compel the deposition, even though the noticed date was still six days in the future, and a motion to deem the RFAs admitted, even though the response date was at least ten days in the future. Plaintiff argued that it was filing those motions in case Defendant did not appear or did not serve RFA response.

Plaintiff cites no law that she may file “just in case” motions to compel. Because the allegedly wrongful act has not yet taken place, and Plaintiff can only surmise what might happen in the future, the motions fail to give Defendant notice of the dispute at issue. Further, the motions were set for hearing after the discovery motion cutoff date. (Code Civ. Proc. ; 2024.020.) The current trial date is March 23, 2020, with a discovery motion cutoff date of March 9, 2020. These motions were set for hearing on March 10 and March 12. They are therefore too late.

For these reasons, the motions are DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN FRANCIS