This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 02:28:22 (UTC).

JULIE SU VS SUMMIT REALTY GROUP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Labor - Wrongful Termination case was filed by JULIE SU against SUMMIT REALTY GROUP INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3824

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCMENT

SU JULIE CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR

Defendants and Respondents

MANNO JOHN

PACIFIC BARUNA CORP.

DOES 1 TO 10

SUMMIT REALTY GROUP INC

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/22/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

DECLARATION OF PHOEBE P. LIU IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE

7/26/2018: DECLARATION OF PHOEBE P. LIU IN SUPPORT OF DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE

VERIFIED ANSWER OF PACIFIC BARUNA CORP TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/29/2018: VERIFIED ANSWER OF PACIFIC BARUNA CORP TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

10/12/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration

11/30/2018: Declaration

Reply

12/6/2018: Reply

Other -

12/6/2018: Other -

Opposition

2/26/2019: Opposition

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/8/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

3/11/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

5/15/2019: Declaration

Request for Dismissal

6/17/2019: Request for Dismissal

DECLARATION OF PHOEBE P. LIU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

7/5/2018: DECLARATION OF PHOEBE P. LIU IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS, JACOB MOJARRO

6/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS, JACOB MOJARRO

Minute Order

4/17/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC., OF JOHN MANNO, AN INDIVIDUAL, VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, DATED 02/22/18 - RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED SERVED 02/27/18

3/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC., OF JOHN MANNO, AN INDIVIDUAL, VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, DATED 02/22/18 - RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED SERVED 02/27/18

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

3/23/2018: DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of Cross-Complaint of John Manno for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order of 3/11/19) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Order to Show Cause Why the Cross-Complaint Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to File Undertaking) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Notice and Application for Order to Show Cause Why the Cross-Complaint Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to File Undertaking); Filed by Travis Breton (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause Why t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Travis Breton (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Declaration (Declaration of Joseph A. Gonnella in support of Application for Order to Show Cause Why the Cross-Complaint Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to File Undertaking); Filed by Travis Breton (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Travis Breton (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Leave to Intervene in Cross-Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 61; Hearing on Motion - Other (to Require Out of State Cross-Complainant to File Undertaking and Stay Proceedings) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Division of Labor Standards Enforcment, (Plaintiff); Su, Julie, California state Labor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Division of Labor Standards Enforcment, (Plaintiff); Su, Julie, California state Labor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC., OF JOHN MANNO, AN INDIVIDUAL, VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, DATED 02/22/18 - RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED SERVED 02/27/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Division of Labor Standards Enforcment, (Plaintiff); Su, Julie, California state Labor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR BACK PAY AND INJIJNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 98.6 AND 1102.5

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC693824    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 61

Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. (“CCP”) section 284 states that “[t]he attorney in an action or special proceeding may be changed at any time before or after judgment or final determination” upon either consent of both client and attorney, or upon the order of the court under application of either the client of the attorney, after notice from one to the other. Cal. Rule of Court 3.1362 states the requirements for a motion to be relieved as counsel under CCP section 284. No memorandum is required, but the motion must be accompanied by (1) a declaration stating why a motion has been brought instead of filing a consent (without compromising attorney-client confidentiality), (2) proof of service of the motion, and (3) all hearing dates scheduled in the action or proceeding, including the date of trial, if know. Additionally, “[t]he proposed order relieving counsel must be prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel--Civil (form MC-053) and must be lodged with the court with the moving papers.”

The present motion pertains to Attorney Jacob I Mojarro of Mojarro Law, P.C., attorney for Pacific Baruna Corp. and John Manno. The motions comply with the above requirements.

Attorney Jacob I. Mojarro of Mojarro Law, P.C.’s Motions to Be Relieved as Counsel for Defendants John Manno and Pacific Baruna Corp. are GRANTED, effective upon the filing of a proof of service of the order upon the client.