This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2019 at 08:57:01 (UTC).

JULIE SU VS LTM FOOD INSDUSTRIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/30/2018 JULIE SU filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LTM FOOD INSDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4447

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SU JULIE CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR

Defendants and Respondents

LTM FOOD INSDUSTRIES INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

LEE'S SANDWICHES

TANG MINH TUAN

TRAN LOUIS DUY

SANDWICHES LEE'S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CONDE DANIELA

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/27/2018: Unknown

Unknown

11/7/2018: Unknown

Unknown

10/9/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/2/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/6/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7/6/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/22/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF DANIELA CONDE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800)

8/28/2018: DECLARATION OF DANIELA CONDE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

8/28/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800)

8/28/2018: BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/28/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

JUDGMENT

8/28/2018: JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

5/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 36; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • BRIEF SUMMARY OF CASE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DANIELA CONDE IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1800)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Su, Julie, California State Labor (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR BACKPAY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR UNLAWFUL DISCHARGE IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE SECTIONS 98.6 AND 1102.5

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SU JULIE CALIFORNIA STATE LABOR COMMIS- is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONDE DANIELA