This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2023 at 21:11:26 (UTC).

JULIE SMOCK VS FRED BARTHEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 JULIE SMOCK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRED BARTHEL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. YOUNG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2635

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMOCK JULIE

Defendants

BARTHEL FRED

TAKARA-BARTHEL STELLA COOKIE NAOMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLEITMAN JEFFREY P

Defendant Attorney

TRAFTON ALAN P

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/9/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/13/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

2/14/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/14/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/18/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/22/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

5/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2024
  • Hearing04/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 04/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to 06/07/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Stella Cookie Naomi Takara-Barthel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Julie Smock (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Julie Smock (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Stella Cookie Naomi Takara-Barthel (Defendant); As to: Julie Smock (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Stella Cookie Naomi Takara-Barthel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Julie Smock (Plaintiff); As to: Stella Cookie Naomi Takara-Barthel (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/09/2023; Service Cost: 64.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department M Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Julie Smock (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Barthel (Defendant); Stella Cookie Naomi Takara-Barthel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Julie Smock (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Barthel (Defendant); Stella Cookie Naomi Takara-Barthel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Julie Smock (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Barthel (Defendant); Stella Cookie Naomi Takara-Barthel (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less