Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 11:59:40 (UTC).

JULIE L. NEUNDORFER ,, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, LINDA R. RYBKA, ET AL. VS AVALON CARE CENTER - MERCED HY-LOND, L.L.C., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 JULIE L NEUNDORFER ,, BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, LINDA R RYBKA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AVALON CARE CENTER - MERCED HY-LOND, L L C . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1437

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RYBKA INDIVIDUALLY LINDA R.

NEUNDORFER JULIE L. BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST LINDA R. RYBKA

RYBKA LINDA R.

NEUNDORFER JULIE L.

Defendants

CORREA GEORGE DINO

AVALON CARE CENTER - MERCED HY-LOND L.L.C. DBA HY-LOND HEALTH CARE CENTER ? MERCED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PECK SPENCER E.

PECK STEVEN C.

PECK ADAM J.

Defendant Attorneys

CICALA ANGELE K.

JACOBSON REUBEN B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/28/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

2/26/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/02/2021

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/02/2021

Receipt for Transmitted Record

3/18/2021: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

3/18/2021: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

3/18/2021: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT DOCUMENTS

RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD - MERCED COUNTY - 21CV-00904

3/30/2021: RECEIPT - RETURNED RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD - MERCED COUNTY - 21CV-00904

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

1/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketReturned Receipt for Transmitted Record - Merced County - 21CV-00904; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Documents; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 24; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Transfer Venue); Filed by Avalon Care Center - Merced Hy-Lond, L.L.C. (Defendant); George Dino Correa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Julie L. Neundorfer (Plaintiff); Linda R. Rybka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julie L. Neundorfer (Plaintiff); Linda R. Rybka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 377.32); Filed by Julie L. Neundorfer (Plaintiff); Linda R. Rybka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Julie L. Neundorfer (Plaintiff); Linda R. Rybka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julie L. Neundorfer (Plaintiff); Linda R. Rybka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Julie L. Neundorfer (Plaintiff); Linda R. Rybka (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CICALA, ANGELE K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON, REUBEN B.