This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 12:24:52 (UTC).

JULIE HAWK VS ISAAC QUINTANILLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 JULIE HAWK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ISAAC QUINTANILLA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5652

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAWK JULIE

Defendants

QUINTANILLA ISAAC

EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON COMPANY

ROTH NELLIE

HILTON HOTELS & RESORTS HOTEL COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/20/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

1/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Complaint

11/20/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/05/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Julie Hawk (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Quintanilla (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Julie Hawk on 11/20/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Julie Hawk as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Julie Hawk (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Quintanilla (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Julie Hawk (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 2 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/05/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from 01/02/2019 to 11/20/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less