This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 15:43:50 (UTC).

JULIANNE GUSE VS MATTEL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 JULIANNE GUSE filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against MATTEL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIHU M. BERLE and ANN I. JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2641

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIHU M. BERLE

ANN I. JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUSE JULIANNE

Defendants

FISHER-PRICE INC.

MATTEL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON MICHAEL K.

SHEA ADAM

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS BART HARPER

GUTIERREZ SUSAN L

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer - DEFENDANTS FISHER-PRICE, INC. AND MATTEL, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/4/2021: Answer - DEFENDANTS FISHER-PRICE, INC. AND MATTEL, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JRAYA MCGINNS

4/23/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JRAYA MCGINNS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ON COORDINATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER ON COORDINATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Other - - ORDER ON STIPULATED ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT STORED INFORMATION PROTOCOL

3/1/2021: Other - - ORDER ON STIPULATED ELECTRONIC DOCUMENT STORED INFORMATION PROTOCOL

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COMPLEX CASE FEE

2/11/2021: Notice - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF COMPLEX CASE FEE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 02/02/2021

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 02/02/2021

Initial Status Conference Order

2/4/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Related Case

1/22/2021: Notice of Related Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • Hearing09/20/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MICHAEL K. JOHNSON TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE; Filed by Julianne Guse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (of Michael K. Johnson); Filed by Michael K. Johnson (Attorney); Julianne Guse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDefendants Fisher-Price, Inc. and Mattel, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Mattel, Inc. (Defendant); Fisher-Price, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/04/2021, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:56 PM in Department 11, Ann I. Jones, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 02/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julianne Guse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julianne Guse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Julianne Guse (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATTEL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON, MICHAEL K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA ADAM