This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 06:53:43 (UTC).

JULIANNA GIN VS DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 JULIANNA GIN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3123

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIN JULIANNA

Defendants

DEL AMO HOSPITAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DEL AMO HOSPITAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/26/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/26/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AMENDED

1/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AMENDED

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/26/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/21/2022

3/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/21/2022

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

4/4/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT); Filed by Julianna Gin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • Docketat 11:22 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/21/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (AMENDED); Filed by Julianna Gin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Julianna Gin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julianna Gin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julianna Gin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEL AMO HOSPITAL, INC., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NALBANDYAN A. JACOB