Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2020 at 20:46:51 (UTC).

JULIANA COLON VS CHEN CHENG YANG

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 JULIANA COLON filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHEN CHENG YANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4799

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLON JULIANA

Defendant

YANG CHEN CHENG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSMAN GENE

Defendant Attorney

PERRY ARIELLA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/29/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/29/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/4/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

4/29/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/17/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Hearing10/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Chen Cheng Yang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Chen Cheng Yang (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Juliana Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juliana Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juliana Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juliana Colon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less