This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 15:40:17 (UTC).

JULIAN GARCIA VS MICHAEL KHORSANDI ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 JULIAN GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICHAEL KHORSANDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, THOMAS D. LONG and CHARLES C. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5347

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

CHARLES C. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GARCIA JULIAN

Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

KHORSANDI MICHAEL

DOES 1 TO 100

NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB INC.

MUHAMMAD SANDRA DBA MODERN PROTECTION

MUHAMMAD SANDRA

ROES 1-25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROESLER BRANDON C.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RUSSELL R. ARENS

PEREZ HECTOR

ARENS RUSSELL RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/9/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/14/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 05/01/2020

5/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) OF 05/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

5/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/20/2020

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

1/9/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Motion

9/30/2019: Notice of Motion

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/12/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

8/16/2019: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/30/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/30/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/31/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Cross-Complaint

7/17/2019: Cross-Complaint

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sandra Muhammad (Cross-Complainant); Nicola's Nightclub, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Michael Khorsandi (Cross-Complainant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Julian Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nicola's Nightclub, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Nicola's Nightclub, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Michael Khorsandi (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB AND MICHAEL KHORSANDI, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF MICHAEL KHORSANDI, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS MICHAEL KHORSANDI TO COMPLAINT OF JULIAN GARCIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Michael Khorsandi (Defendant); Nicola's Nightclub, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Michael Khorsandi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY-NEGLIGENT/ INTENTIONAL CR[MJNAL CONDUCT OF OTHERS. ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julian Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICOLA'S NIGHTCLUB INC. DBA NICOLA'S GENTLEMEN'S CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROESLER BRANDON