This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2022 at 00:14:38 (UTC).

JULIAN C. AJCALON, VS EAST COAST FOODS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 JULIAN C AJCALON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EAST COAST FOODS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4451

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AJCALON JULIAN C.

Defendants

EAST COAST FOODS INC.

SHIFTPIXY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DE SARIO JAMES A.

MEDINA IVAN P.

NOURMAND MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/29/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Order - ORDER INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

6/29/2022: Order - ORDER INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/29/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

6/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/29/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Proof of Personal Service

6/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:36 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOrder (Initial Status Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of 06/29/2022, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Julian C. Ajcalon, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julian C. Ajcalon, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julian C. Ajcalon, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Julian C. Ajcalon, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST COAST FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ShiftPixy Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDINA IVAN P.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE SARIO JAMES A.