This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2022 at 19:08:04 (UTC).

JULIA MARLENE MORENO DE HERNANDEZ VS MELODY GRIMMETT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 JULIA MARLENE MORENO DE HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MELODY GRIMMETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8632

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO DE HERNANDEZ JULIA MARLENE

Defendants

GRIMMETT MELODY

DRIMMETT DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEIDARI SAM RYAN

Defendant Attorney

DIAMOND SCOTT RORY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/23/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

9/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Answer

9/22/2021: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

11/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

11/24/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/24/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2024
  • Hearing05/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Melody Grimmett (Defendant); Dennis Drimmett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dennis Drimmett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Melody Grimmett (Defendant); Dennis Drimmett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Melody Grimmett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Melody Grimmett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Julia Marlene Moreno de Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Julia Marlene Moreno de Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Julia Marlene Moreno de Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Julia Marlene Moreno de Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIDARI SAM