Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 10:01:20 (UTC).

JULIA GANCHEV-CHASE VS TWO R LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 JULIA GANCHEV-CHASE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TWO R LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5013

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GANCHEV-CHASE JULIA

Defendants

BECK SYLVIA

BECK WALTER H.

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

LEVITT GARY

MSEL LLC

LANDER RICKI NOEL

WANG JIEFU

HILL MARK

TWO R LLC

KRAFT ROBERT K.

GRUSHCOW ALAN R.

GRUSHCOW JUDI G.

KOLAR CHRISTOPHER P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/6/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/21/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2024
  • Hearing04/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • Hearing10/05/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JULIA GANCHEV-CHASE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JULIA GANCHEV-CHASE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JULIA GANCHEV-CHASE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARZBAN MICHAEL M.