This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2022 at 15:51:11 (UTC).

JULEEN CAMPBELL VS DANIEL EDWARD ARRIOLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 JULEEN CAMPBELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL EDWARD ARRIOLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9422

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMPBELL JULEEN AKA JULEEN MORENO

Defendants

ARRIOLA DANIEL EDWARD

PINEDA TIFFANY

PINERA TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH ROBERT F.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/26/2021: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/26/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/9/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2024
  • Hearing10/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • Hearing04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • Hearing04/11/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JULEEN CAMPBELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JULEEN CAMPBELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JULEEN CAMPBELL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED SMITH (LORENZO GASPARETTI)