This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 17:19:53 (UTC).

JUICE CAPITAL, LLC, A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS URBAN COMMONS BATTERY PARK, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 JUICE CAPITAL, LLC, A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against URBAN COMMONS BATTERY PARK, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4701

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUICE CAPITAL LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

JUICE CAPTIAL LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

URBAN COMMONS BATTERY PARK LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERD HEATHER

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/8/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/8/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Default Judgment

11/22/2021: Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

11/22/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 11/22/2021

11/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 11/22/2021

Request for Dismissal

10/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

10/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/28/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/28/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/21/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Request for Entry of Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Entry of Default Judgment) of 11/22/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Request for Entry of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juice Captial, LLC, a Wyoming limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where URBAN COMMONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Herd, Heather Nicole