This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2020 at 03:07:42 (UTC).

JUDY THOMAS ET AL VS ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 JUDY THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4290

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

THOMAS JAMES

THOMAS JUDY

SERGYOUS ASHRAF NAIMLATIF

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Cross Defendants

THOMAS JAMES

THOMAS JUDY

Defendants, Respondents, Not Classified By Court and Cross Defendants

SUPERSHUTTLE

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

THOMAS SERVICES INC.

JAMBA JUICE COMPANY

MOUSA ZAKARIA ARAFAT

SERGYOUS ASHRAF NAIMLATIF

CMCS 3 JUICE LP

THOMAS SERVICES INC. DBA SUPERSHUTTLE

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

MOUSA ZAKARIA ARAFAT

SERGYOUS ASHRAF NAIMLATIF

Defendants, Respondents, Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

THOMAS SERVICES INC.

JAMBA JUICE COMPANY

MOUSA ZAKARIA ARAFAT

THOMAS JAMES

SERGYOUS ASHRAF NAIMLATIF

HERNANDEZ ERNESTO

BEL-AIR COUNTRY CLUB

THOMAS SERVICES INC. DBA SUPERSHUTTLE

Defendants, Respondents, Not Classified By Court, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SUPERSHUTTLE

SERGYOUS ASHRAF NAIMLATIF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

NADEL NORMAN ROBERT ESQ.

BELGUM STEPHEN L.

OZOWARA BEVERLY

BELGUM STEPHEN LEE ESQ.

CARRICO ALAN ANTHONY ESQ.

NADEL NORMAN R. ESQ.

BELOFSKY DAVID ARTHUR ESQ.

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BELGUM STEPHEN L.

Defendant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

BELOFSKY & HANKER

NADEL NORMAN R. ESQ.

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY T. SCHNEIDER

CULLMAN LORI M.

BELOFSKY DAVID ARTHUR

NADEL NORMAN ROBERT ESQ.

LONG MICHAEL FRANCIS ESQ.

BELOFSKY DAVID ARTHUR ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BELOFSKY & HANKER

LAW OFFICE OF ANTHONY T. SCHNEIDER

CULLMAN LORI M.

Cross Defendant Attorneys

KWONG PAUL CLINTON ESQ.

KWONG PAUL CLINTON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA, DATED 9/21/18

3/2/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY ZAKARIA ARAFAT MOUSA, DATED 9/21/18

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE RELATED TO 19STCV17867; CASE MANAGEM...)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE RELATED TO 19STCV17867; CASE MANAGEM...)

Case Management Statement

12/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND MATERIAL - AMENDED

10/15/2019: Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND MATERIAL - AMENDED

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/13/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BEVERLY OZOWARA

6/13/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BEVERLY OZOWARA

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

6/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Objection - OBJECTION TO MISSTATEMENTS CONTAINED IN DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/25/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO MISSTATEMENTS CONTAINED IN DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND MATERIAL FACTS

6/25/2019: Response - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED AND MATERIAL FACTS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

7/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Order - ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5/6/2019: Order - ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Answer

2/25/2019: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LONG IN SUPPORT OF JAMBA JUICE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL LONG IN SUPPORT OF JAMBA JUICE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment

3/18/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/18/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

CoverSheet -

2/13/2018: CoverSheet -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/13/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • Hearing03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Hearing03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding answer/responsive pleading by Jamba Juice to the cross complaint of Naimlatif filed 4/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Hearing03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Cross Complaint filed by Zakaria Arafat Mousa, dated 9/21/18); Filed by Zakaria Arafat Mousa (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to the Cross Complaint filed by Ashraf Naimlatif Sergyous, on 4/17/18); Filed by Ashraf Naimlatif Sergyous (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial ((Related to 19STCV17867)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to Plaintiff's COMPLAINT only); Filed by James Thomas (Plaintiff); Judy Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((Related to 19STCV17867)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference (Related to 19STCV17867) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Thomas (Plaintiff); Judy Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Thomas (Plaintiff); Judy Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by James Thomas (Plaintiff); Judy Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by James Thomas (Plaintiff); Judy Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by James Thomas (Plaintiff); Judy Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694290    Hearing Date: October 28, 2019    Dept: 2

r/t 19STCV17867 AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the Southeast District, Norwalk, JUDGE M. BERNAL presiding in Department F for further reassignment. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.