This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2023 at 01:44:35 (UTC).

JUDY FISHMAN VS DAVID PAUL LARUE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 JUDY FISHMAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID PAUL LARUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0342

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FISHMAN JUDY

Defendant

LARUE DAVID PAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLASKIN HAROLD CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Mail

5/18/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

8/15/2022: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

8/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/9/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/4/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

8/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/24/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/05/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/25/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docket; Default not entered as to DAVID PAUL LARUE; On the Complaint filed by JUDY FISHMAN on 05/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: JUDY FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID PAUL LARUE (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JUDY FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID PAUL LARUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JUDY FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID PAUL LARUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JUDY FISHMAN (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID PAUL LARUE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less