Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 07:18:03 (UTC).

JUDITH KOFFLER VS DANIEL DONOHOE ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 JUDITH KOFFLER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL DONOHOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7465

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KOFFLER JUDITH

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

DONOHOE DANIEL

STURGIS DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WEINSTEIN ZEV Y.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/14/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice

3/27/2018: Notice

Proof of Personal Service

3/21/2018: Proof of Personal Service

CoverSheet

3/9/2018: CoverSheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

3/9/2018: Summons

Complaint

3/9/2018: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Judith Koffler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Notice of Errate re Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Judith Koffler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Complaint For Personal Injury; Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Judith Koffler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Judith Koffler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEINSTEIN ZEV YONI