Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 21:23:20 (UTC).

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, A PUBLIC ENTITY VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA, A PUBLIC ENTITY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0493

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY

JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAGLE SHARON M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Refund / Order

6/16/2021: Request for Refund / Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/16/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2024
  • Hearing05/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by Judicial Council of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Judicial Council of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Judicial Council of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Judicial Council of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGLE, SHARON M.